This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:46:38 (UTC).

Flood v. First Family Insurance, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Flood filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against First Family Insurance, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Nicholas P. Mizell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00623

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Flood

Defendants

Marra Jason

FIRST FAMILY INSURANCE, INC.

Jason Marra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell L. Feldman

Attorney at Feldman Legal Group

6940 W Linebaugh Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33625-5823

Defendant Attorney

Scott Edward Atwood

Attorney at Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA

1715 Monroe St, Po Box 280

Ft Myers, FL 33902-0280

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER re #12 Notice of settlement. This action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days to (1) submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or (2) move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/15/2020. (SMG) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of settlement by Stephen Flood (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Stephen Flood as to Jason Marra. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Stephen Flood as to First Family Insurance, Inc.. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#5

(#5) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

4 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to First Family Insurance, Inc., Jason Marra. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(drn) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

3 #1

Proposed Summons Summons (Marra)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stephen Flood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons (Marra))(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FIRST FAMILY INSURANCE, INC., Marra Jason with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201580) filed by Stephen Flood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified on 8/20/2020 (drn). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re #12 Notice of settlement. This action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days to (1) submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or (2) move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/15/2020. (SMG) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER. The parties filed #12 Notice of Settlement in which they represented that this matter has settled. By November 11, 2020, the parties will file any items necessary to terminate this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/14/2020. (brh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of settlement by Stephen Flood (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. By October 13, 2020, First Family Insurance, Inc. and Jason Marra will file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/29/2020. (brh) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. By September 30, 2020, Defendants will file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/15/2020. (brh) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Stephen Flood as to Jason Marra. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Stephen Flood as to First Family Insurance, Inc.. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to First Family Insurance, Inc., Jason Marra. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(drn) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stephen Flood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons (Marra))(Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-623-FtM-66NPM. (SJB) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FIRST FAMILY INSURANCE, INC., Marra Jason with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201580) filed by Stephen Flood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified on 8/20/2020 (drn). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less