This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:36:56 (UTC).

Flood v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Flood filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anna J. Brown and Youlee Yim You. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01393

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Anna J. Brown

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth A. Flood

Defendant

Commissioner Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katie Taylor

Attorney at Harder, Wells, Baron & Manning, P.C.

474 Willamette Street

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant Attorneys

Renata Gowie

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office District of Oregon

1000 Sw Third Ave, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Lisa Goldoftas

Attorney at Social Security Administation

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jw) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance of Lisa Goldoftas appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Goldoftas, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jw) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7117545. Filed by Kenneth A. Flood against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Taylor, Katie) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less