This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2021 at 09:24:23 (UTC).

Flint v. ServiceSource Delaware, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Flint filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ServiceSource Delaware, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerel Flint

Defendant

ServiceSource Delaware, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas B. Janney, III

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas B. Janney III

2021 Richard Jones Road, Suite 310A

Nashville, TN 37215

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie Goff Sanders

Attorney at Webb Sanders PLLC (Nashville Office)

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

Daniel Caden Crowell

Attorney at Webb Sanders PLLC (Nashville Office)

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Proposed Initial Case Management Order filed by Jerel Flint. (Janney, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on June 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/18/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ServiceSource Delaware, Inc..(Crowell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Caden Crowell and Leslie Goff Sanders admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Caden Crowell on behalf of ServiceSource Delaware, Inc. (Crowell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Jerel Flint. ServiceSource Delaware, Inc. served on 4/14/2021. (Janney, Douglas) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to ServiceSource Delaware, Inc. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.). (kc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ServiceSource Delaware, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503344844), filed by Jerel Flint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) Modified on 4/2/2021 (kc). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Caden Crowell