This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2021 at 07:56:28 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Roku Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Flexiworld Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Roku Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Roku Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Austin Ginnings

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Edward Nelson, III

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C.

3131 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Ryan Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75201

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Defendant Attorneys

Maria A. Stubbings

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Martin E. Gilmore

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W 2Nd St., Suite 1900

Austin, TX 78701

Matthew Cook Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Patrick J. McKeever

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Ruben Tyler Kendrick

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

24 #15

Exhibit 12

24 #12

Exhibit 9

24 #11

Exhibit 8

24 #10

Exhibit 7

24 #9

Exhibit 6

24 #6

Exhibit 3

24 #5

Exhibit 2

#8

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2- 056 Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit 1- US Patent 11,096,056

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Cook Bernstein for Cory Owan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15360964) by on behalf of Roku Inc.. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruben Tyler Kendrick on behalf of Roku Inc. . Attorney Ruben Tyler Kendrick added to party Roku Inc. (pty:dft) (Kendrick, Ruben) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Transfer Case VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Roku Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Venkatesh Tumatikrishnan, #3 Affidavit Declaration of R. Tyler Kendrick, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12)(Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Sealed Document: Response in Opposition to Roku's Motion to Dismiss Due to Lack of Standing ('056 Patent) of #13 Sealed Motion to Dismiss Due to Lack of Standing ('056 Patent) by Roku Inc. by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William H. Chang (Confidential), #2 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10 (Confidential), #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17) (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maria A. Stubbings. Attorney added for Roku Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick J. McKeever. Attorney added for Roku Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Martin E. Gilmore. Attorney added for Roku Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ruben Tyler Kendrick for Maria A. Stubbings ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15330543) by on behalf of Roku Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendrick, Ruben) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ruben Tyler Kendrick for Patrick J. McKeever ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15330130) by on behalf of Roku Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendrick, Ruben) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ruben Tyler Kendrick for Martin E. Gilmore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15329966) by on behalf of Roku Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendrick, Ruben) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Roku Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Griffin on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Ryan Griffin added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Nelson, III on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Edward Nelson, III added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Charles Austin Ginnings added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Ginnings, Charles) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15147201), filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- US Patent 11,096,056, #2 Exhibit 2- 056 Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roku, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Edward Gilmore, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew C Bernstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick John McKeever