This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2021 at 10:56:00 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Roku Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Flexiworld Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Roku Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00767

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Roku Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Charles Austin Ginnings

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Edward Nelson, III

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C.

3131 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Ryan Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Cook Bernstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #8

Exhibit 8- '031 Chart

5 #7

Exhibit 7- '257 Chart

5 #6

Exhibit 6-'822 Chart

5 #5

Exhibit 5-'577 Chart

5 #4

Exhibit 4-'031

5 #3

Exhibit 3-'257

5 #2

Exhibit 2-'822

5 #1

Exhibit 1-'577

#5

#4

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Roku Inc. answer due 10/5/2021. (bw) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint to October 5, 2021 by Roku Inc. re #5 Complaint, (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE Roku's Notice of Unopposed Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to September 20, 2021 by Roku Inc. re #5 Complaint, (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Roku Inc. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Griffin on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Nelson, III on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Roku Inc. (ir) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Charles Austin Ginnings added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Ginnings, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15055981), filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-'577, #2 Exhibit 2-'822, #3 Exhibit 3-'257, #4 Exhibit 4-'031, #5 Exhibit 5-'577 Chart, #6 Exhibit 6-'822 Chart, #7 Exhibit 7- '257 Chart, #8 Exhibit 8- '031 Chart, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roku, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew C Bernstein