This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/30/2022 at 08:42:42 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies Inc v. Hisense Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 Flexiworld Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hisense Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04337

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd.

Hisense International Co., Ltd.

Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Austin Ginnings

John Nixon Mahaffey

Steven G. Hill

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Defendant Attorneys

Linda Ann Klein

Matthew C Bernstein

Patrick McKeever

Kristin S. Tucker

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint #36 . The deadline for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint is hereby extended until March 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/27/2022. (gas) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

36 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

36 #36

Main Document

#35

(#35) ORDER granting Joint Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadlines #34 . The Court ORDERS that the Hisense Defendants do not have to respond to the existing complaint (Dkt. 1) and shall have through and including January 27, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's forthcoming amended complaint, which shall be filed no later than January 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/30/2022. (gas) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

34 #1

Text of Proposed Order

34 #34

Main Document

4 #11

Summons(es)

4 #8

Summons(es)

4 #7

Summons(es)

4 #6

Summons(es)

4 #4

Summons(es)

4 #1

Summons(es)

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Ginnings, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit AO 120

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint #36 . The deadline for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint is hereby extended until March 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/27/2022. (gas) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) ORDER granting Joint Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadlines #34 . The Court ORDERS that the Hisense Defendants do not have to respond to the existing complaint (Dkt. 1) and shall have through and including January 27, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's forthcoming amended complaint, which shall be filed no later than January 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/30/2022. (gas) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Forthcoming Amended Complaint re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Linda) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick J. McKeever Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214852).. Attorney Patrick McKeever added appearing on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (pdt) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214833).. Attorney Matthew C Bernstein added appearing on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (kkh) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Schneider Tucker on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (Tucker, Kristin) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick J. McKeever Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214852).by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Linda) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12214833).by Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Linda) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Ann Klein on behalf of Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. (Klein, Linda) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 07/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd., Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Summons(es), #10 Summons(es), #11 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Ginnings, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8990704.), filed by Flexiworld Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit AO 120)(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/31/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less