This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2022 at 08:55:45 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies Inc v. Hisense Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Flexiworld Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hisense Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

Hisense Co., Ltd.

QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,

Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd.

QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD.

Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd.

Hisense International Co., Ltd.

Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd.

Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.

HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD.

Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd.

Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is

Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Austin Ginnings

Timothy E Grochocinski

Defendant Attorney

Matthew C Bernstein

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

6 #1

Summons(es) Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

4 #11

Summons(es)

4 #8

Summons(es)

4 #7

Summons(es)

4 #4

Summons(es)

4 #3

Summons(es)

4 #2

Summons(es)

4 #1

Summons(es)

4 #4

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD. to 12/3/2022; Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is to 12/3/2022; HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense International Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd. to 12/3/2022; QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD., to 12/3/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/4/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd., Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd. served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to QINGDAO HISENSE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Guiyang Hisense Electronics Co., Ltd., Guiyang Industrial and Commercial Assets Management Co., Ltd. is, HISENSE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA HOLDINGS CO., LTD., Hisense Co., Ltd., Hisense Electronica Mexico S.A. de C.V., Hisense Import & Export Co. Ltd., Hisense International (HK) Co., Ltd., Hisense International (Hong Kong) America Investment Co., Ltd., Hisense International Co., Ltd., Hisense Visual Technology Co., Ltd., QINGDAO HUATONG STATE-OWNED CAPITAL OPERATION (GROUP) CO. LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Summons(es), #10 Summons(es), #11 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Ginnings, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8990704.), filed by Flexiworld Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit AO 120)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less