This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2021 at 10:04:12 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Canon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On February 11, 2021, Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (“Plaintiff” or “Flexiworld”), represented by Joseph Paul Oldaker and Timothy E. Grochocinski of Nelson Bumgardner Albritton, PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Canon, Inc (“CI”). and Canon Solutions America, Inc.(“CSAI”) collectively (“Defendant” or “Canon”), seeking damages and other relief under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for allegedly infringing Flexiworld’s intellectual property relating to printers, printer controllers, printer software, or printer firmware for supporting wireless printing or printing over air and various other technologies. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the  Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 9,036,181 entitled “Wireless printing device for printing digital content received via wireless communication compatible, at least partly, with IEEE 802.11 or Bluetooth,” (the ‘181 Patent”), 10,140,071 entitled “Printers, printer controllers, printer software, or printer firmware for supporting wireless printing or printing over air,” (the ‘071 Patent”), 10,481,846 entitled “Software applications and information apparatus for printing over air or for printing over a network,” (the ‘846 Patent”), 10,642,576 entitled “Mobile information apparatus that includes wireless communication circuitry for discovery of an output device for outputting digital content at the wirelessly discovered output device,” (“the ‘576 Patent”) and 10,761,791 entitled “Wireless printing devices that provide printing services over a network without a need for a client device of the printing device to use, at the client device, a printer specific printer driver,” owned by Flexiworld (“Patents in suit”).

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “Flexiworld has developed wireless applications and embedded solutions for the short-range wireless and mobile device market.” and that “Canon has infringed and continues to infringe (literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents), directly, indirectly, and/or through subsidiaries, agents, representatives, or intermediaries, one or more claims of each of the Patents-in-Suit by making, using, importing, testing, supplying, causing to be supplied, selling, and/or offering for sale in the United States the Accused Wireless Printers and/or the Accused Canon Apps (collectively “the Accused Products”).”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Canon’s customers have directly infringed and continue to directly infringe the Patents-in-Suit by using the Accused Products. Through its product manuals, website, and/or sales and marketing activities, Canon solicits, instructs, encourages, and aids and abets its customers to purchase and use the Accused Products in an infringing way.

 

Five claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff are for the infringement of one or more claims of the ‘181, Patent, the ‘071 Patent, the ‘846 Patent, the ‘576 Patent and ‘791 Patent respectively.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Canon has directly and/or indirectly infringed one or more claims of each of the Patents-in-Suit, that Plaintiff is entitled to past and future damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284. Plaintiff further requested the court to order Canon to pay Flexiworld reasonable ongoing royalties on a going-forward basis, pre and post judgement interest along with costs of action.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

Canon, Inc.

Canon Solutions America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Joseph Paul Oldaker

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton, PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#12

#8

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

14 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Canon Solutions America, Inc. answer due 5/13/2021. (lad) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including May 13, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Re Canon Solutions America, Inc. by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. as to Canon, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. as to Canon Solutions America, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Canon Solutions America, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Paul Oldaker on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Oldaker, Joseph) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9,2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco Division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event. (am) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14479404), filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Canon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CANON BUSINESS SOLUTIONS-EAST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Oldaker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Edward Grochocinski