This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:27:23 (UTC).

Flettrich v. Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Flettrich filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Chevron Oronite Company L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01986

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Flettrich

Defendants

Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C.

Jerry Ockmand

ABC Insurance Company

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Patrick Connick

Attorney at Law Office of J. Patrick Connick, LLC

5201 Westbank Expy, Ste 315

Marrero, LA 70072

Defendant Attorneys

Monique M. Weiner

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Skylar B. Rudin

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

28 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

28 #1

Memorandum in Support

#28

(#28) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Weiner, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

27 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

27 #1

Memorandum in Support

#27

(#27) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jerry Ockmand. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Weiner, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#26

(#26) Order: IT IS ORDERED that the automatic referral of this matter for trial on the merits before the Magistrate Judge under Local Rule 73.2 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/15/2021.(pp) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#25

(#25) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Preliminary Conference held on 12/15/2021. The parties advised that there was not unanimous consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28:636(c). Accordingly, the presiding district judge is hereby notified so that he may revoke the automatic referral of this matter. Currently pending are two Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by each Defendant and a Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff. The parties agreed to waive initial disclosures at this time. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/15/2021. (NEF: Section B) (sa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C., and Jerry Ockmand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weiner, Monique) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (pp). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Jerry Ockmand. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Monique M. Weiner added to party Jerry Ockmand(pty:dft).(Weiner, Monique) Modified text/link on 11/17/2021 (pp). (Entered: 11/16/2021)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Weiner, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jerry Ockmand. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Weiner, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order: IT IS ORDERED that the automatic referral of this matter for trial on the merits before the Magistrate Judge under Local Rule 73.2 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/15/2021.(pp) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Preliminary Conference held on 12/15/2021. The parties advised that there was not unanimous consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28:636(c). Accordingly, the presiding district judge is hereby notified so that he may revoke the automatic referral of this matter. Currently pending are two Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by each Defendant and a Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff. The parties agreed to waive initial disclosures at this time. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/15/2021. (NEF: Section B) (sa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C., and Jerry Ockmand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weiner, Monique) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (pp). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 Response to Motion. **Image filed sideways. Clerk has corrected image. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Flettrich . (Connick, John) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/14/2021) (pp). Modified text on 12/14/2021 (pp). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER AND REASONS - The filing of the Second Amended Complaint renders moot Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amending and Supplemental Complaint (ECF No. #12 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/13/2021. (sa) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Flettrich . (Connick, John) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (pp). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Flettrich.(Connick, John) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Petition for Damages.**Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 9 to document 1. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Jerry Ockmand. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Monique M. Weiner added to party Jerry Ockmand(pty:dft).(Weiner, Monique) Modified text/link on 11/17/2021 (pp). (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages is extended by 21 days or until and including November 25, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/5/2021. (sa) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply .**Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiner, Monique) Modified text on 11/5/2021 (pp). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Remocal by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weiner, Monique) Modified text/link on 11/2/2021 (pp). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C. (Weiner, Monique) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. (pp) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District Court for the Parish of Pla, case number 66-986 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9084085) filed by Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)Attorney Monique M. Weiner added to party Chevron Oronite Company L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Weiner, Monique) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron Oronite Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Skylar B Rudin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monique M. Weiner