This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2021 at 09:28:51 (UTC).

Fletcher v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Fletcher filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Madison County Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01101

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher M Fletcher

Defendants

Madison County Sheriff's Department

Justin Nance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David J Canupp

George W Royer, Jr

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

09/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Madison County Sheriff's Department; Plaintiff's response is due by October 4, 2021, defendants' reply, if any, is due by October 8, 2021. The parties are reminded of the briefing schedule outlined in Apendix III attached hereto. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 09/23/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Madison County Sheriff's Department. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Madison County Sheriff's Department. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher M Fletcher. Madison County Sheriff's Department served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (No date on greencard). (AKD) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Justin Nance. Delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher M Fletcher. Madison County Sheriff's Department served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (AKD) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Madison County Sheriff's Department. Delivered to Plaintiff for service. (AKD) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number H4601034896 (AKD) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, Justin Nance, filed by Christopher M Fletcher.(AKD) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less