This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2021 at 08:41:14 (UTC).

Fletcher v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Fletcher filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Illinois Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00791

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony L Fletcher

Pinckneyville, IL 62274

Defendants

Illinois Department of Corrections

Rob Jeffreys

Pinckneyville Correctional Center

David Mitchell

Field Service Office

Placement Resource Group

S Brown

Mark Schafer

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide the Court with the $402.00 filing fee or a properly completed IFP Motion on or before September 22, 2021. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an additional copy of the form IFP Motion. (Action due by 9/22/2021). Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/23/2021. (tjk) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Judge David W. Dugan. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: Plaintiff was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Plaintiff shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 8/5/2021 (jaj) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NATURE of Citizens Complaint by Anthony L Fletcher. (jaj) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 7/8/2021. Consent due by 7/29/2021 (jaj) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This Court has received your complaint from the Central District of Illinois, previously assigned case number: 21-1190. Your new case number is 21-791-DWD. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/8/2021. (jaj) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 1:21-cv-01190. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/8/2021. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: In the interest of justice and for the parties' convenience, this Court transfers this suit under 28 U.S.C. 1391(b) and 1404(a) to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois for whatever action(s) the transferee court deems appropriate. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Remark: IFP form attached pursuant to Text Order entered 7/8/2021 (SAG) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/8/2021. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against S Brown, Field Service Office, Illinois Department of Corrections, Rob Jeffreys, David Mitchell, Pinckneyville Correctional Center, Placement Resource Group, Mark Schafer, filed by Anthony L Fletcher.(SAG) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINCKNEYVILLE CORRECTIONAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois Department of Corrections is a litigant