This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 07:01:36 (UTC).

Fleming v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Fleming filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08487

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jacqueline Fleming

Jacqueline Baker

Defendant

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mohammed Omar Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Victor Thomas Metroff

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorney

Raseq Moizuddin

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Jacqueline Fleming of Settlement (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jacqueline Fleming. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Fleming by Victor Thomas Metroff (Metroff, Victor) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Fleming by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Fleming by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Fleming; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16570681. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Jacqueline Fleming of Settlement (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jacqueline Fleming. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Fleming by Victor Thomas Metroff (Metroff, Victor) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Fleming by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Fleming by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Fleming; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16570681. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less