This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:08:05 (UTC).

Fleming v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Labor - Employee Benefit case was filed by Fleming against Prudential Insurance Company of America in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01328

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William L Fleming

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company of America

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Jansen, Per) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Prudential's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shelley R. Hebert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5939920 (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda A. Sonneborn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5939901 (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/25/2019, (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Reilly, D) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Prudential Insurance Company of America (SNP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Prudential Insurance Company of America (Receipt # 0981-5896475), filed by William L Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Jansen, Per) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Prudential's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shelley Renee Hebert for defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda A. Sonneborn for defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shelley R. Hebert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5939920 (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda A. Sonneborn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5939901 (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/25/2019, (Jansen, Per) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Per Jansen for Prudential Insurance Company of America added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (SWT) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Reilly, D) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Prudential Insurance Company of America (SNP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Prudential Insurance Company of America (Receipt # 0981-5896475), filed by William L Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.