This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:38:55 (UTC).

FLEMING v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 FLEMING filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-20122

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARILYN FLEMING

Defendants

MERCK & CO., INC.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

MCKESSON CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOLLIE K WELLINS

Attorney at MARC J BERN & PARTNERS LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

MARGARET CORDNER

Attorney at MARC J BERN & PARTNERS LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

Defendant Attorney

DINO S. SANGIAMO

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 E Pratt St Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Merck & Co. Inc.

1 #3

Summons McKesson Corp.

1 #4

Summons Merck Sharp and Dohme Corp.

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-91) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLIE K WELLINS on behalf of MARILYN FLEMING with Certificate of Service(WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARILYN FLEMING. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARILYN FLEMING. MARILYN FLEMING waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE BY WHICH DEFENDANTS MERCK & CO., INC. AND MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. MAY RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ID EXTENDED 30 DAYS TO AND INCLUDING 2/2/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/4/22. 1/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOC. NO. #10 MAILED TO UNREP ON 1/5/22. (amas, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE BY WHICH DEFENDANTS MERCK & CO., INC. AND MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. MAY RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ID EXTENDED 30 DAYS TO AND INCLUDING 2/2/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/4/22. 1/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARILYN FLEMING. MARILYN FLEMING waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARILYN FLEMING. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLIE K WELLINS on behalf of MARILYN FLEMING with Certificate of Service(WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:21-cv-19578. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-91) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketJudge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12949276) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARILYN FLEMING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Merck & Co. Inc., #3 Summons McKesson Corp., #4 Summons Merck Sharp and Dohme Corp.)(CORDNER, MARGARET) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINO S. SANGIAMO