This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 08:27:52 (UTC).

Fleming v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Fleming filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02797

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen Fleming

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Merchants Credit Guide Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yaakov Saks

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza, Suite 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601-2726

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin M. Hogan

Attorney at Polsinelli Pc

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Rodney L. Lewis

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Ruddy S-A. Abam

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kathleen Fleming by Yaakov Saks (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by August 10, 2022. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (unopposed) (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Kevin M. Hogan (Hogan, Kevin) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's agreed motion for an extension of time to file responsive pleading (Dckt. No. #5 ) is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 25, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Fleming as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Fleming as to Merchants Credit Guide Company on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company for extension of time - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time (Dckt. No. #11 ) is granted. Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide, Co. shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 21, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#16

(#16) Notice of Settlement as to Merchants Credit Guide Company by Kathleen Fleming (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Settlement as to Merchants Credit Guide Company by Kathleen Fleming (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time (Dckt. No. #11 ) is granted. Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide, Co. shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 21, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Company for extension of time - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Fleming as to Merchants Credit Guide Company on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Fleming as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's agreed motion for an extension of time to file responsive pleading (Dckt. No. #5 ) is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 25, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Kevin M. Hogan (Hogan, Kevin) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (unopposed) (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by August 10, 2022. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Merchants Credit Guide Company (ak, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kathleen Fleming by Yaakov Saks (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Fleming; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19508284. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney L. Lewis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin M. Hogan