This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 05:47:19 (UTC).

Fleming v. Champaign County IL et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Fleming filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Champaign County IL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jonathan E. Hawley and Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02070

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Fleming

Defendants

K Kalagian

Champaign County, Illinois

Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin D Gould

Nicolette Anne Ward

Defendant Attorneys

Keith Eric Fruehling

Bryan Jeffrey Vayr

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Champaign County, Illinois, Jones.(Fruehling, Keith) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bryan Jeffrey Vayr on behalf of Champaign County, Illinois (Vayr, Bryan) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Keith Eric Fruehling on behalf of Champaign County, Illinois (Fruehling, Keith) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #7 Defendant Joshua Jones' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Jones' answer or other responsive pleading is due by 7/1/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/13/2019. (KZ, ilcd) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Jones. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Fruehling, Keith) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bryan Jeffrey Vayr on behalf of Jones (Vayr, Bryan) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Keith Eric Fruehling on behalf of Jones (Fruehling, Keith) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Alias Summons Issued as to Champaign County, Illinois, Jones, K Kalagian. (Mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service.) (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Champaign County, Illinois, Sgt. Jones, and K. Kalagian. (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicolette Anne Ward on behalf of Brian Fleming (Ward, Nicolette) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/25/19. Case is reassigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade and referred to Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley to use the correct random judge deck due to nature of the case. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce and Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long are no longer assigned to case. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3066660.), filed by Brian Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gould, Martin) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less