This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:12:37 (UTC).

Fleitz v. Bonefish Grill, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Fleitz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bonefish Grill, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David J. Hale and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00918

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha Jeana Fleitz

Defendants

Bonefish Grill, LLC

Bloomin' Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony T. Colyer

Attorney at Colyer Law Firm, PLLC

239 S. Fifth Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorney

Edwin A. Jones

Attorney at Boehl Stopher & Graves, LLP - Paducah

410 Broadway Street

Paducah, KY 42002-9551

 

Court Documents

7 #7

Exhibit G - Thomason v. Outback Steakhouse of FL

7 #6

Exhibit F - Bloomin Brands DE SOS report

7 #5

Exhibit E - Listing subsidiaries of Bloomin Brands

7 #4

Exhibit D - OSI Restaurant DE SOS report

7 #3

Exhibit C - OSI HoldCo, Inc. FL SOS report

7 #2

Exhibit B - OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC FL SOS report

7 #1

Exhibit A - Bonefish Grill FL SOS report

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to re #6 Order to Show Cause on the Issue of Diversity Related to Bonefish Grill, LLC, RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bonefish Grill FL SOS report, #2 Exhibit B - OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC FL SOS report, #3 Exhibit C - OSI HoldCo, Inc. FL SOS report, #4 Exhibit D - OSI Restaurant DE SOS report, #5 Exhibit E - Listing subsidiaries of Bloomin Brands, #6 Exhibit F - Bloomin Brands DE SOS report, #7 Exhibit G - Thomason v. Outback Steakhouse of FL) (Jones, Edwin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/30/2019 - Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (KD) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/23/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. No later than twenty-one (21) days before the Rule 16 conference, counsel for the parties shall conduct the conference of parties required by Rule 26(f). Within fourteen (14) days after the Rule 26(f) conference of parties, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of Authority to Consent to Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer Filed in State Court Action

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bonefish Grill, LLC and Bloomin' Brands, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-007585 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3005374). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Answer Filed in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Authority to Consent to Removal, #4 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to re #6 Order to Show Cause on the Issue of Diversity Related to Bonefish Grill, LLC, RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bonefish Grill FL SOS report, #2 Exhibit B - OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC FL SOS report, #3 Exhibit C - OSI HoldCo, Inc. FL SOS report, #4 Exhibit D - OSI Restaurant DE SOS report, #5 Exhibit E - Listing subsidiaries of Bloomin Brands, #6 Exhibit F - Bloomin Brands DE SOS report, #7 Exhibit G - Thomason v. Outback Steakhouse of FL) (Jones, Edwin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/30/2019 - Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (KD) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/23/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. No later than twenty-one (21) days before the Rule 16 conference, counsel for the parties shall conduct the conference of parties required by Rule 26(f). Within fourteen (14) days after the Rule 26(f) conference of parties, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/19/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Bloomin' Brands, Inc. and Bonefish Grill, LLC. (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bonefish Grill, LLC and Bloomin' Brands, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-007585 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3005374). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Answer Filed in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Authority to Consent to Removal, #4 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.