This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 07:20:57 (UTC).

Fleenor v. Firelands Regional Medical Center

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Fleenor filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Firelands Regional Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01552

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Fleenor

Defendant

Firelands Regional Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Francis J. Landry

Attorney at Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg

1090 West South Boundary Street

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Katherine A. Pawlak

Attorney at Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg

1090 West South Boundary Street

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Defendant Attorney

Robert Meredith Moore

Attorney at Firelands Regional Medical Center

1111 Hayes Avenue

Sandusky, OH 44870

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 8/29/19. At the request of counsel, Settlement Conference set for 9/9/19 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. If the case does not settle at that time, Court will hold a CMC and set a case schedule. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/29/19. (S,Na) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Marginal Entry Order granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/29/2019.(D,L) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jessica Fleenor. Firelands Regional Medical Center waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Jessica Fleenor (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Jessica Fleenor. (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Application Form AO239) filed by Plaintiff Jessica Fleenor. (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Firelands Regional Medical Center.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Jessica Fleenor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 8/29/19. At the request of counsel, Settlement Conference set for 9/9/19 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. If the case does not settle at that time, Court will hold a CMC and set a case schedule. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/29/19. (S,Na) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Marginal Entry Order granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/29/2019.(D,L) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 8/29/19 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jessica Fleenor. Firelands Regional Medical Center waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Jessica Fleenor (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Jessica Fleenor. (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Application Form AO239) filed by Plaintiff Jessica Fleenor. (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Firelands Regional Medical Center.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Jessica Fleenor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firelands Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine A. Pawlak

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis J. Landry