This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2019 at 07:59:32 (UTC).

Flaws v. Akal Security, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Flaws filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Akal Security, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-06140

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jayme Flaws

Defendant

Akal Security, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Lowe Stiles

Attorney at Cornerstone Law Firm

8350 North St. Clair Avenue, Suite 225

Kansas City, MO 64151

Marc N. Middleton

Attorney at Cornerstone Law Firm

8350 North St. Clair Avenue, Suite 225

Kansas City, MO 64151

Defendant Attorneys

Robert A Sheffield

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC-KCMO Walnut

1201 Walnut, Ste. 1450

Kansas City, MO 64106

Whitney Fay

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC-KCMO Walnut

1201 Walnut, Ste. 1450

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Robert A Sheffield on behalf of Defendant Akal Security, Inc..(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Pretrial Conference via telephone to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel set for 12/10/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Signed on 12/2/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#11

(#11) RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 12/2/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#10

(#10) PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 11/26/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Whitney Fay on behalf of Akal Security, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fay, Whitney) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#8

(#8) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Honorable Jay Daugherty(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Jayme Flaws. (Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Plaintiff Jayme Flaws.(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Akal Security, Inc..(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/29/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/19/2019. Signed on 10/15/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert A Sheffield on behalf of Defendant Akal Security, Inc..(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Platte County, case number 19AE-CC00276, filed by Robert A Sheffield on behalf of Akal Security, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6536257. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Robert A Sheffield on behalf of Defendant Akal Security, Inc..(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Pretrial Conference via telephone to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel set for 12/10/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Signed on 12/2/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 12/2/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 11/26/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Whitney Fay on behalf of Akal Security, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fay, Whitney) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Honorable Jay Daugherty(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Jayme Flaws. (Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Plaintiff Jayme Flaws.(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Akal Security, Inc..(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/29/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/19/2019. Signed on 10/15/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert A Sheffield on behalf of Defendant Akal Security, Inc..(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Platte County, case number 19AE-CC00276, filed by Robert A Sheffield on behalf of Akal Security, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6536257. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sheffield, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AKAL SECURITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A Sheffield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney Fay