Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 09:37:54 (UTC).

Flaugh et al v. Kennedy et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Flaugh filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Kennedy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perry Flaugh

Melvyn Klein

Defendants

Robert E. Beauchamp

William R. Spivey

Robert O. Work

Stephen J. Hadley

Letitia A. Long

Adriane M. Brown

Ellen M. Pawlikowski

Vernon E. Clark

James A. Winnefeld, Jr.

George R. Oliver

Anthony F. O'Brien

Thomas A. Kennedy

Michael J. Wood

Dinesh C. Paliwal

Marta R. Stewart

Tracy A. Atkinson

Nominal Defendants

Raytheon Technologies Corporation

Raytheon Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SO ORDERED re (7 in 1:20-cv-01614-MN, 3 in 1:21-cv-00037-MN, 4 in 1:21-cv-00057-MN) Stipulation and Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions. SEE STIPULATION FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/3/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #7

(#3) Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions by Hugues Gervat, Perry Flaugh, Melvyn Klein, Hong Yi Mo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Verification of Perry Flaugh

1 #1

Verification of Melvyn Klein

#1

(#1) VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Tracy A. Atkinson, Robert E. Beauchamp, Adriane M. Brown, Vernon E. Clark, Stephen J. Hadley, Thomas A. Kennedy, Letitia A. Long, Anthony F. O'Brien, George R. Oliver, Dinesh C. Paliwal, Ellen M. Pawlikowski, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, William R. Spivey, Marta R. Stewart, James A. Winnefeld, Jr., Michael J. Wood, Robert O. Work - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3464607.) - filed by Perry Flaugh, Melvyn Klein. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Melvyn Klein, #2 Verification of Perry Flaugh, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-01614-MN. (dlw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SO ORDERED re (7 in 1:20-cv-01614-MN, 3 in 1:21-cv-00037-MN, 4 in 1:21-cv-00057-MN) Stipulation and Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions. SEE STIPULATION FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/3/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions by Hugues Gervat, Perry Flaugh, Melvyn Klein, Hong Yi Mo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Tracy A. Atkinson, Robert E. Beauchamp, Adriane M. Brown, Vernon E. Clark, Stephen J. Hadley, Thomas A. Kennedy, Letitia A. Long, Anthony F. O'Brien, George R. Oliver, Dinesh C. Paliwal, Ellen M. Pawlikowski, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, William R. Spivey, Marta R. Stewart, James A. Winnefeld, Jr., Michael J. Wood, Robert O. Work - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3464607.) - filed by Perry Flaugh, Melvyn Klein. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Melvyn Klein, #2 Verification of Perry Flaugh, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raytheon Technologies Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where RAYTHEON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst