This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:35:15 (UTC).

Flat v. Capital Link Management LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Flat filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capital Link Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Skretny and H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00722

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Skretny

Referral Judge

H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean Flat

Defendant

Capital Link Management LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Lawrence Hilton

Attorney at Hilton Parker LLC

7544 Slate Ridge Blvd.

Reynoldsburg, OH 43068

Geoffrey Craig Parker

Attorney at Hilton Parker LLC

7544 Slate Ridge Blvd.

Reynoldsburg, OH 43068

Defendant Attorneys

Brendan H. Little

Attorney at Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

Carmen Alexander Vacco

Attorney at Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Alexander Vacco on behalf of Capital Link Management LLC (Vacco, Carmen) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Link Management LLC. (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING NOTICE on Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Strike. Defendant's response is due by July 28, 2021. Plaintiff's reply is due by August 4, 2021. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court, if necessary. (JCM) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Strike #4 Answer to Complaint by Sean Flat.(Parker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Craig Parker on behalf of Sean Flat (Parker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER. Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/8/2021. (JCM) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Link Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent CLM Enterprise Group, Inc. for Capital Link Management LLC.. (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital Link Management LLC.(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Flat. Capital Link Management LLC served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Capital Link Management LLC. (TMK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital Link Management LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4271155, filed by Sean Flat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital Link Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan Hoffman Little