This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 09:44:36 (UTC).

Flanders v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Flanders filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06607

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Flanders

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Jaroslawicz

Attorney at Jaroslawicz & Jaros, LLC

225 Broadway, Suite 2410

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Keri L Arnold

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP (NYC)

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/2/2020) (sjo) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application granted. (Altria Group Distribution Company answer due 9/30/2020; Altria Group, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Juul Labs, Inc. answer due 10/8/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Keri Arnold dated August 25, 2020. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc...(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jason Flanders.(Jaroslawicz, David) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Jaroslawicz on behalf of Jason Flanders..(Jaroslawicz, David) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

7 #5

Exhibit E - State Court Docket.

7 #4

Exhibit D - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Re

7 #3

Exhibit C - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Re

7 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Summons

7 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of County of New York. Case Number: 155563-2020..Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Regarding Electronic Filing - As to Altria Group, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Regarding Electronic Filing - as to Altria Group Distribution Company, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket.).(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CIVIL COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS FOR DEFENDANTS ALTRIA GROUP, INC. AND ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY served on Plaintiff Jason Flanders, and Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc...(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Group Distribution Company. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company..(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altria Group, Inc...(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Written Consent to Removal on Behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Juul Labs, Inc...(Horowitz, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155563-2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21211035).Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Arnold, Keri) Modified on 8/19/2020 (sj). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:20-cv-06245, filed on 09/03/2020. (sjo) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/2/2020) (sjo) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application granted. (Altria Group Distribution Company answer due 9/30/2020; Altria Group, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Juul Labs, Inc. answer due 10/8/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Keri Arnold dated August 25, 2020. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc...(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jason Flanders.(Jaroslawicz, David) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Jaroslawicz on behalf of Jason Flanders..(Jaroslawicz, David) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of County of New York. Case Number: 155563-2020..Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Regarding Electronic Filing - As to Altria Group, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Regarding Electronic Filing - as to Altria Group Distribution Company, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket.).(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CIVIL COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS FOR DEFENDANTS ALTRIA GROUP, INC. AND ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY served on Plaintiff Jason Flanders, and Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc...(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Keri L Arnold to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Group Distribution Company. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company..(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altria Group, Inc...(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Written Consent to Removal on Behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Juul Labs, Inc...(Horowitz, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Arnold, Keri) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155563-2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21211035).Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Arnold, Keri) Modified on 8/19/2020 (sj). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less