This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:33:59 (UTC).

FLAGG v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 FLAGG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02203

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELISSA FLAGG

Defendants

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chris Allan Moeller

Attorney at KEN NUNN LAW OFFICE

104 South Franklin Rd.

Bloomington, IN 47404

Defendant Attorney

Katherine S. Strawbridge

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/30/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2021. Discovery due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/29/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#14

(#14) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on September 21, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#13

(#13) Statement Responding to the Allegations of the Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Moeller, Chris) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Allan Moeller on behalf of Plaintiff MELISSA FLAGG. (Moeller, Chris) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER - Defendants removed this action to this Court on August 21, 2020, alleging that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. [Filing No. 1.] Local Rule 81-1 provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. Although more than 30 days have passed since the filing of the Notice of Removal, Plaintiff has not filed a response as required by Local Rule 81-1. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by October 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/28/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP . (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP.(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/24/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S. Strawbridge on behalf of Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #3

State Court Record (Plaintiffs Complaint, Appearance, Summons and Return of Serv

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A- Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D12-2007-CT-025953, filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6142141) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record (Plaintiffs Complaint, Appearance, Summons and Return of Service for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP))(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/30/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2021. Discovery due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/29/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on September 21, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Statement Responding to the Allegations of the Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Moeller, Chris) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Allan Moeller on behalf of Plaintiff MELISSA FLAGG. (Moeller, Chris) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - Defendants removed this action to this Court on August 21, 2020, alleging that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. [Filing No. 1.] Local Rule 81-1 provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. Although more than 30 days have passed since the filing of the Notice of Removal, Plaintiff has not filed a response as required by Local Rule 81-1. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by October 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/28/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP . (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP.(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/24/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S. Strawbridge on behalf of Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D12-2007-CT-025953, filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6142141) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record (Plaintiffs Complaint, Appearance, Summons and Return of Service for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP))(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chris Allan Moeller