This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 09:56:04 (UTC).

FKA Distributing Co., LLC v. Bear Down Brands, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 FKA Distributing Co , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bear Down Brands, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02436

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics

FKA Distributing Co., LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as HoMedics

Defendant

Bear Down Brands, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William E Thomson, Jr

Attorney at Brooks Kushman P.C.

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1635

Mark A. Cantor

Attorney at Brooks Kushman PC

1000 Town Center 22Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

William E. Thomson, Jr.

Attorney at Brooks Kushman PC

445 South Figueroa Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1635

Marc Lorelli

Attorney at Brooks Kushman PC

1000 Town Center 22Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Willis Richards

Attorney at Ropes and Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue 6Th Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94303-2284

David S Chun

Attorney at Ropes and Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

#21

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#11

6 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C - Cease and desist letter to Bear Down Brands

1 #2

Exhibit B - USPN 7,652,436

1 #1

Exhibit A - USPN 7,303,300

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #20 . Defendant Bear Down Brands, LLC may have up to, and including, March 25, 2021 to file a response to the Complaint in this action. (twdb) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 03/25/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bear Down Brands, LLC answer now due 2/23/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC.(Lorelli, Marc) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David S Chun counsel for Defendant Bear Down Brands, LLC. Adding David S. Chun as counsel of record for Bear Down Brands, LLC, for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bear Down Brands, LLC,. (Attorney David S Chun added to party Bear Down Brands, LLC(pty:dft))(Chun, David) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Willis Richards counsel for Defendant Bear Down Brands, LLC. Adding Daniel W. Richards as counsel of record for Bear Down Brands, LLC, for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bear Down Brands, LLC,. (Attorney Daniel Willis Richards added to party Bear Down Brands, LLC(pty:dft))(Richards, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Mark A. Cantor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FKA Distributing Co., LLC, Plaintiff, designating William Thomson Jr. as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #7 Non-Resident Attorney Marc Lorelli APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FKA Distributing Co., LLC, Plaintiff, designating William Thomson Jr. as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Josephine L. Staton, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:20-cv-02378 JLS(ADSx) (rn) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bear Down Brands, LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc Lorelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29785331) filed by plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark A. Cantor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29784976) filed by plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics. (Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics, (Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics. (Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics. (Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29782368 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 7,303,300, #2 Exhibit B - USPN 7,652,436, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and desist letter to Bear Down Brands) (Attorney William E Thomson, Jr added to party FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics(pty:pla))(Thomson, William) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FKA Distributing Co., LLC d/b/a HoMedics is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Edward Thomson Esq. III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Cantor Esq.