This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2023 at 14:20:17 (UTC).

Fivecoat v. Charter Communications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Fivecoat filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Charter Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan C. Bucklew and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02875

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan C. Bucklew

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew L. Fivecoat

Defendants

Charter Communications, LLC

AmSher Collection Services, Inc.

Maury Cobb Attorney at Law, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steve D. Tran

Attorney at eXL Legal, PLLC

12425 28Th Street N., Suite 200

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendant Attorneys

Sangeeta P. Spengler

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Michael Schuette

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr. Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618-4317

Dayle Marie Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618-4317

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Schuette on behalf of AmSher Collection Services, Inc. Lead Counsel: Michael P. Schuette. (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by AmSher Collection Services, Inc. Related case(s): No (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Amsher Collection Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss by Andrew L. Fivecoat. (Tran, Steve) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sangeeta P. Spengler on behalf of Charter Communications, LLC (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Amsher Collection Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss by Andrew L. Fivecoat. (Tran, Steve) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tran, Steve) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#17

(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 4/19/2023; Defendants' expert disclosures due by 5/15/2023; Conduct mediation hearing by 10/2/2023; Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2023; Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's April 2024 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 2/8/2023. (SLB) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 4/19/2023; Defendants' expert disclosures due by 5/15/2023; Conduct mediation hearing by 10/2/2023; Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2023; Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's April 2024 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 2/8/2023. (SLB) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Docket(#16) ENDORSED ORDER discharging 14 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 2/8/2023. (SLB) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tran, Steve) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to show cause by a written response filed on or before 2/7/2023 why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 3.10 for lack of prosecution due to the non-filing of a Case Management Report within the time prescribed by Local Rule 3.02(b). Failure to respond shall result in this action being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/31/2023. (SLB) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 the MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Amsher Collection Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss by Andrew L. Fivecoat. Plaintiff shall file his response on or before 2/20/23. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/30/2023. (DMB) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Amsher Collection Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss by Andrew L. Fivecoat. (Tran, Steve) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sangeeta P. Spengler on behalf of Charter Communications, LLC (Spengler, Sangeeta) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to #8 AmSher Collection Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss due by 1/30/2023. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/30/2022. (SLB) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Amsher Collection Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss by Andrew L. Fivecoat. (Tran, Steve) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by AmSher Collection Services, Inc. Related case(s): No (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Schuette on behalf of AmSher Collection Services, Inc. Lead Counsel: Michael P. Schuette. (Schuette, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Michael P. Schuette, Dayle M. Van Hoose of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-2875-SCB-AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit In and For Pinellas County, Florida, case number 22-CI-005364 filed in State Court on 11/10/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-20319972 filed by AmSher Collection Services, Inc.(Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuette, Michael) Modified text on 12/20/2022 (KME). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less