This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:22:18 (UTC).

Fitzpatrick v. Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Fitzpatrick filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01328

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Fitzpatrick

Defendant

Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinidad P. Galdean

Attorney at Galdean Law Firm

4601 East Douglas, P.O. Box 780076

Wichita, KS 67278

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Rondeau

Attorney at Watkins Calcara, Chtd.

Po Box 1110

Great Bend, KS 67530

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/19/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/19/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/16/20. (aw) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc..(Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/16/2020 for Defendant Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/30/2019. (jk) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Rondeau on behalf of Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.. (Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thomas Fitzpatrick. (Galdean, Trinidad) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4998397.), filed by Thomas Fitzpatrick.(Galdean, Trinidad) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/19/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/19/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/16/20. (aw) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc..(Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/16/2020 for Defendant Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/30/2019. (jk) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Rondeau on behalf of Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc.. (Rondeau, Mark) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Mid-America Redi-Mix, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thomas Fitzpatrick. (Galdean, Trinidad) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4998397.), filed by Thomas Fitzpatrick.(Galdean, Trinidad) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.