This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:17:42 (UTC).

Beata Kishner et al v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Beata Kishner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10301

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEATA KISHNER

Consolidated Plaintiff

John Fitzgerald

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Defendants

Commissioner of SSA

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M Fitzgerald

Attorney at Leibovic Law Group

21540 Plummer Street Unit B

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHERI PYM [SOCIAL SECURITY]: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM SIMILAR ORDERS BY OTHER JUDGES: Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint and a copy of this order on defendant in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants counsel shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint. Defendant shall electronically serve on plaintiff a complete copy of the administrative record within 90 days of the service of the complaint (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #7 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kca) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHERI PYM [SOCIAL SECURITY]: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM SIMILAR ORDERS BY OTHER JUDGES: Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint and a copy of this order on defendant in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants counsel shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint. Defendant shall electronically serve on plaintiff a complete copy of the administrative record within 90 days of the service of the complaint (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #7 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kca) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Beata Kishner. (Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (jtil) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) - Non-Final #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF BEATA KISHNER. (Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF BEATA KISHNER, (Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF BEATA KISHNER. (Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF BEATA KISHNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney John M Fitzgerald added to party BEATA KISHNER(pty:pla))(Fitzgerald, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.