This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:46:30 (UTC).

Fitters v. Secretary, Department of Veteran Affairs

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Fitters filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Veteran Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01032

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberta Fitters

Defendants

Robert L. Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs

Secretary, Department of Veteran Affairs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Joseph Butler

Attorney at Mezibov Butler

615 Elsinore Place, Suite 105

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Daniel J. Treadaway

Attorney at Mezibov Butler

615 Elsinore Place, Suite 105

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Secretary, Department of Veteran Affairs. (sct) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Secretary, Department of Veteran Affairs. (sct) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Robert L. Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7228878), filed by Roberta Fitters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.