This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 07:03:47 (UTC).

Fitistics. LLC v. Huawei Device Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Fitistics LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Device Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fitistics. LLC

Defendants

Huawei Device Co., Ltd.

Huawei Device USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Francis McDonough, III

Carey Matthew Rozier

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Phillip Love

Steven Mark Geiszler

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER denying #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/7/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until April 26, 2023,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/13/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until April 26, 2023, by Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fitistics. LLC. Huawei Device Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 1/26/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time until March 2, 2023, to Answer Complaint re Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

5 #1

Summons(es)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Francis McDonough, III on behalf of Fitistics. LLC (McDonough, James) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fitistics. LLC (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

1 #4

Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 11,252,236

1 #3

Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 11,252,235

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER denying #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/7/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Huawei Device USA, Inc. to 4/26/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until April 26, 2023,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/13/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until April 26, 2023, by Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fitistics. LLC. Huawei Device Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 1/26/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Huawei Device USA, Inc. to 3/2/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time until March 2, 2023, to Answer Complaint re Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Francis McDonough, III on behalf of Fitistics. LLC (McDonough, James) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fitistics. LLC (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9299913.), filed by Fitistics. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 8,915,823, #2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 11,185,738, #3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 11,252,235, #4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 11,252,236, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons(es) Huawei Device Co., Ltd., #7 Summons(es) Huawei Device USA, Inc.)(Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less