This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 08:27:16 (UTC).

FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY L.L.C. v. GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-10928

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY L.L.C. doing business as FISHER HEALTHCARE doing business as FISHER SCIENTIFIC

Defendant

GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC doing business as TRUEGENX doing business as SCIENTIA DIAGNOSTICS doing business as SCIENTIADX doing business as SCIENTIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

317 George St.Suite 320

New Brunswick, NJ 08901

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN W. LEARDI

Attorney at BUTTACI LEARDI & WERNER LLC

212 Carnegie Centersuite 202

Princeton, NJ 08540

FRANK XAVIER WUKOVITS

Attorney at BUTTACI LEARDI & WERNER LLC

212 Carnegie Centersuite 202

Pricneton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Stipulation & Proposed Consent Order

#10

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter from C. Carton to Judge Hammer re: consolidation re #10 Letter. (CARTON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Frank X. Wukovits to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation & Proposed Consent Order)(WUKOVITS, FRANK) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/3/2021. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/23/2021. (jqb, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WUKOVITS, FRANK) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: Defendant's June 14, 2021 request [D.E. 6] to extend the deadline to answer until June 21, 2021 is granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/15/2021. (Hammer, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Defendant Gene Tox Worldwide, LLC. (WUKOVITS, FRANK) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK XAVIER WUKOVITS on behalf of GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC (WUKOVITS, FRANK) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/15/2021. (jc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Gene Tox Worldwide LLC.. (LEARDI, JOHN) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN W. LEARDI on behalf of GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC (LEARDI, JOHN) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GENE TOX WORLDWIDE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters. Do not include d/b/a as part of the name, add them as an alias instead. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Guide to Searching and Entering Parties https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/PartyNameGuideforAttorneys.pdf (jr, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gene Tox Worldwide, LLC d/b/a TrueGenX d/b/a Scientia Diagnostics d/b/a ScientiaDX d/b/a Scientia ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12445937), filed by Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. d/b/a Fisher Healthcare d/b/a Fisher Scientific. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(CARTON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R. Carton