This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:47:25 (UTC).

Fischler v. NVA Manhattan Management Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Fischler filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against NVA Manhattan Management Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09218

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Fischler

Defendants

NVA RE, LLC doing business as Tribeca Soho Animal Hospital

NVA Manhattan Management Inc. doing business as Tribeca Soho Animal Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Howard Lowe

Attorney at Lipsky Lowe LLP

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 1830

New York, NY 10170

Defendant Attorneys

Peter T. Shapiro

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Water St)

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

Colby Berman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NVA RE, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25304609)Document filed by Brian Fischler..(Lowe, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lowe, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NVA RE, LLC d/b/a Tribeca Soho Animal Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Fischler..(Lowe, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NVA RE, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by NVA RE, LLC..(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for all of the parties hereto as follows: 1. The case caption and Complaint are amended such that NVA Manhattan Management Inc. is substituted as the defendant herein in lieu of NVA RE, LLC; 2. Peter T. Shapiro of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP hereby appears as counsel for NVA Manhattan Management Inc.; 3. The deadline for defendant to answer the complaint shall be extended to January 7, 2022. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Attorney Peter T. Shapiro for NVA Manhattan Management Inc. added., NVA Manhattan Management Inc. answer due 1/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/20/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colby Berman on behalf of NVA Manhattan Management Inc...(Berman, Colby) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#8

(#8) SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Peter T. Shapiro dated January 6, 2022. Document filed by NVA Manhattan Management Inc...(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Peter T. Shapiro dated January 6, 2022. Document filed by NVA Manhattan Management Inc...(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colby Berman on behalf of NVA Manhattan Management Inc...(Berman, Colby) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for all of the parties hereto as follows: 1. The case caption and Complaint are amended such that NVA Manhattan Management Inc. is substituted as the defendant herein in lieu of NVA RE, LLC; 2. Peter T. Shapiro of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP hereby appears as counsel for NVA Manhattan Management Inc.; 3. The deadline for defendant to answer the complaint shall be extended to January 7, 2022. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Attorney Peter T. Shapiro for NVA Manhattan Management Inc. added., NVA Manhattan Management Inc. answer due 1/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/20/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by NVA RE, LLC..(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NVA RE, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NVA RE, LLC d/b/a Tribeca Soho Animal Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Fischler..(Lowe, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lowe, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NVA RE, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25304609)Document filed by Brian Fischler..(Lowe, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter T. Shapiro Esq.