This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 09:02:19 (UTC).

Firstime Manufactory, Inc. et al v. M/V Maersk Essen et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Firstime Manufactory, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against M/V Maersk Essen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08183

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Firstime Manufactory, Inc.

Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc.

Defendants

Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited

Maersk A/S

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A.

M/V Maersk Essen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin F Casey

Attorney at Casey & Barnett, LLC

305 Broadway, Suite 1202

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, Maersk A/S and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc., Firstime Manufactory, Inc...(Casey, Martin) Modified on 10/7/2021 (pc). (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Ltd., Maersk A/S and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc., Firstime Manufactory, Inc...(Casey, Martin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., Maersk A/S..(pc) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., Maersk A/S..(pc) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Ltd., Maersk A/S and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc., Firstime Manufactory, Inc...(Casey, Martin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Martin F Casey to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party names on the summons must exactly match what is listed on the complaint caption title ( MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A.). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, Maersk A/S and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc., Firstime Manufactory, Inc...(Casey, Martin) Modified on 10/7/2021 (pc). (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Martin F Casey to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant party name errors. Defendant party names must correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Martin F Casey. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Martin F Casey. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M/V Maersk Essen, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Air Sea Group for Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc.; Corporate Parent Firstime Design Limited for Firstime Manufactory, Inc.. Document filed by Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc., Firstime Manufactory, Inc...(Casey, Martin) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Casey, Martin) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, Maersk A/S and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc., Firstime Manufactory, Inc...(Casey, Martin) Modified on 10/5/2021 (vf). (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, M/V Maersk Essen, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., Maersk A/S. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25148448)Document filed by Firstime Manufactory, Inc., Air Sea Transport (Chicago) Inc...(Casey, Martin) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin F. Casey