This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:23:36 (UTC).

First United Methodist Church of Morehead City v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 First United Methodist Church of Morehead City filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Indian Harbor Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First United Methodist Church of Morehead City

Defendants

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona "SCO"

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Insurance Compnay

Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London

HDI Global Specialty, SE f/k/a International Insurance Co. of Hannover SE

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty, SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wesley A. Collins

Attorney at Harvell & Collins, P.A.

1107 Bridges St.

Morehead City, NC 28557

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Michael O'Brien

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

4141 Parklake Ave., Suite 530

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have up to and including December 15, 2021 to serve a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/18/2021. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona "SCO", HDI Global Specialty, SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Compnay, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#15

(#15) Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael O'Brien on behalf of All Defendants. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B- Underlying Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A- Policy

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have up to and including December 15, 2021 to serve a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/18/2021. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona "SCO", HDI Global Specialty, SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Compnay, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #15 Notice of Appearance. The attorney information in the signature block does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel is directed to update contact information in CM/ECF by choosing "Utilities" and selecting "Maintain Your Account." Contact the clerk's office if additional assistance is required. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael O'Brien on behalf of All Defendants. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time #14 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including November 15, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/18/2021. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond To The Complaint. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Attorney Kevin Michael O'Brien should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond To The Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona "SCO", HDI Global Specialty, SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Compnay, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona "SCO" identifying Corporate Parent SCOR Reinsurance Company, Inc. for General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona "SCO". (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Specialty, SE f/k/a International Insurance Co. of Hannover SE (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group for Lexington Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Union Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by QBE Specialty Insurance Company (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Safety Specialty Insurance Compnay identifying Corporate Parent Tokyo Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Safety National Casualty Corporation for Safety Specialty Insurance Compnay. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Steadfast Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zuricih American Insurance Company for Steadfast Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by United Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Company for United Specialty Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Carteret County Courthouse, case number 21 CVS 878. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6268547), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Underlying Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant