This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 08:28:02 (UTC).

First United Methodist Church et al v. Becerra et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 First United Methodist Church filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian C. Buescher and Michael D. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Buescher

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

First United Methodist Church

Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Xavier Becerra

United States Department of Health & Human Services

Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dan H. Ketcham

Attorney at ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1350, Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102

Samuel A. Huckle

Attorney at ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1350, Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102

Defendant Attorney

Lynnett M. Wagner

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4632559), by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, First United Methodist Church(Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to Xavier Becerra regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Requested as to United States Department of Health & Human Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Requested as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Samuel A. Huckle has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to defendants Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, and United States Department of Health & Human Services. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Xavier Becerra c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Atty for the Dist. of NE, US Attorney's Office defendant Xavier Becerra on 5/12/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept of Health & Human Svc, c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Atty for the Dist of NE, US Atty's Office defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services on 5/12/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Attorney for the Dist. of NE, US Attorney's Office defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 5/13/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services c/o Attorney General of the US, US Dept. of Justice, c/o Merrick Garland defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept. of Health & Human Svc, c/o Attorney General of the US, US Dept. of Justice, c/o Merrick Garland defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept. of Health & Human Svc, c/o Xavier Becerra defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Xavier Becerra, Secretary of the US Dept. of Health & Human Svcs. defendant Xavier Becerra on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Plaintiffs Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc..(Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#18

(#18) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health & Human Services.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health & Human Services.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Plaintiffs Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc..(Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Xavier Becerra, Secretary of the US Dept. of Health & Human Svcs. defendant Xavier Becerra on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept. of Health & Human Svc, c/o Xavier Becerra defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept. of Health & Human Svc, c/o Attorney General of the US, US Dept. of Justice, c/o Merrick Garland defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services c/o Attorney General of the US, US Dept. of Justice, c/o Merrick Garland defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 5/16/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Attorney for the Dist. of NE, US Attorney's Office defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services on 5/13/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept of Health & Human Svc, c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Atty for the Dist of NE, US Atty's Office defendant United States Department of Health & Human Services on 5/12/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Xavier Becerra c/o Jan W. Sharp, US Atty for the Dist. of NE, US Attorney's Office defendant Xavier Becerra on 5/12/2022. (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to defendants Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, and United States Department of Health & Human Services. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Samuel A. Huckle has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Requested as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to United States Department of Health & Human Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to Xavier Becerra regarding Complaint #1 . (Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4632559), by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, First United Methodist Church(Ketcham, Dan) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First United Methodist Chrurch is a litigant

Latest cases where Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant