This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 09:07:59 (UTC).

First United Corporation v. Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 First United Corporation filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02592

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First United Corporation

Defendants

J. Abbott R. Cooper

Driver Management Company, LLC

Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP

Ethan C. Elzen

Michael J. Driscoll

Lisa Narrell-Mead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason R Scherr

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Michael L Charlson

Attorney at Vinson and Elkins LLP

555 Mission St. Ste. 2000

San Francisco, CA 94105

George Faulkner Ritchie, IV

Attorney at Gordon Feinblatt LLC

233 E Redwood St

Baltimore, MD 21201

Meghan L Natenson

Attorney at Vinson and Elkins LLP

555 Mission St. Ste. 2000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason York Hoo Siu

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1111 Penn Ave.

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

26 #28

Exhibit W

26 #27

Exhibit V

26 #26

Exhibit U

26 #25

Exhibit T

26 #24

Exhibit S- PART 2

26 #23

Exhibit S - PART 1

26 #22

Exhibit R - PART 2

26 #21

Exhibit R - PART 1

26 #20

Exhibit Q

#4

#3

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit D- Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal

1 #4

Exhibit C- Summons

1 #3

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Amended Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Jason R. Scherr

#1

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimfor Relief filed by First United Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ritchie, George) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Joint MOTION Joint Line Adding Exhibits to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment re #7 Amended Complaint by J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherr, Jason) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/13/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimfor Relief by First United Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ritchie, George) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimfor Relief by J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jason R. Scherr, #3 Appendix of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R - PART 1, #22 Exhibit R - PART 2, #23 Exhibit S - PART 1, #24 Exhibit S- PART 2, #25 Exhibit T, #26 Exhibit U, #27 Exhibit V, #28 Exhibit W)(Scherr, Jason) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) QC NOTICE: #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP was filed incorrectly. **Each exhibit must be filed as a separate attachment to the main document. Please refile the motion as the main document with the memorandum and each individual exhibit as attachments to the main document. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix of Exhibits - Part 1, #3 Appendix of Exhibits - Part 2, #4 Appendix of Exhibits - Part 3)(Scherr, Jason) Modified on 9/30/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Meghan Natenson. Directing attorney Meghan Natenson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael L Charlson. Directing attorney Michael L Charlson to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meghan L Natenson by First United Corporation. The fee has already been paid.(Ritchie, George) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP (Scherr, Jason) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR GARRETT COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Michael J. Driscoll, Lisa Narrell-Mead, and Ethan C. Elzen by First United Corporation. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP filed by First United Corporation.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition TO #5 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by First United Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George F. Ritchie, IV, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jason R. Scherr, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Certificate of Service)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to J. Abbott R. Cooper.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against J. Abbott R. Cooper, Driver Management Company, LLC, Driver Opportunity Partners I, LP, Michael J. Driscoll, Lisa Narrell-Mead, Ethan C. Elzen filed by First United Corporation.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Garrett County, case number C-11-CV-20-000042. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8850542), filed by First United Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason R. Scherr, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Summons, #5 Exhibit D- Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, #6 Exhibit E - Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit F - Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scherr, Jason) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRIVER'S MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L Charlson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason R Scherr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Faulkner Ritchie