This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:13:02 (UTC).

First National Bank of North Arkansas v. Knox et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 First National Bank of North Arkansas filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Knox. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03029

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First National Bank of North Arkansas

Defendants

Lisa Ann Hammons

USDA Farm Service Agency

Paul Arden Knox, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather Ryan Campbell

Attorney at Heather Campbell

1830 Shelby Ln.

Fayetteville, AR 72704

Defendant Attorney

Seth Creed

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

414 Parker Ave

Fort Smith, AR 72901

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #7 Motion to Extend. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2019. (lgd) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Creed, Seth) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by First National Bank of North Arkansas. (Campbell, Heather) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Creed, Seth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with exhibits filed in State Court against Lisa Ann Hammons, Paul Arden Knox, II and USDA Farm Service Agency, filed by First National Bank of North Arkansas.(tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by USDA Farm Service Agency. (tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Carroll County, case number 08ECV-18-152., filed by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #7 Motion to Extend. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2019. (lgd) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Creed, Seth) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by First National Bank of North Arkansas. (Campbell, Heather) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #5 Separate Defendant USDA Farm Service Agency's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Separate Defendant USDA Farm Service Agency's responsive pleading must be filed on or before MAY 22, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 23, 2019. (slc) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Creed, Seth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with exhibits filed in State Court against Lisa Ann Hammons, Paul Arden Knox, II and USDA Farm Service Agency, filed by First National Bank of North Arkansas.(tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by USDA Farm Service Agency. (tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Carroll County, case number 08ECV-18-152., filed by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(tg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.