This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 07:40:43 (UTC).

First Fidelity Bank v. Temenos U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 First Fidelity Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Temenos U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00685

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Fidelity Bank

Defendants

Temenos U.S.A., Inc.

Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Anthony Gibson

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Scott James Leonhardt

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Dean McKinley Measley

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Temenos AG for Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC, Temenos U.S.A., Inc. filed by Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC, Temenos U.S.A., Inc.. (Measley, Dean) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to July 27, 2022 - filed by First Fidelity Bank. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by First Fidelity Bank. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Fidelity Bank. Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Fidelity Bank. Temenos U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by First Fidelity Bank. (smg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending the Time to Answer the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC answer due 7/27/2022; Temenos U.S.A., Inc. answer due 7/27/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Temenos AG for Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC, Temenos U.S.A., Inc. filed by Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC, Temenos U.S.A., Inc.. (Measley, Dean) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to July 27, 2022 - filed by First Fidelity Bank. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by First Fidelity Bank. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORAL ORDER: Answers were due to be filed on 6/27/2022 (see D.I. #4 ; D.I. #5 ), and to date none have been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2022. (nms) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER: The motion to seal complaint (D.I. #6 ) is DENIED. The complaint has been public for more than two weeks when the motion to seal was filed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/21/2022. (nms) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Seal Complaint - filed by First Fidelity Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Jason) Modified on 6/15/2022 (nms). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Fidelity Bank. Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Fidelity Bank. Temenos U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (smg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by First Fidelity Bank. (smg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Temenos Cloud Americas, LLC, Temenos U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3882469.) - filed by First Fidelity Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Fidelity Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean McKinley Measley