This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 09:58:39 (UTC).

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Fireman's Fund Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Vitus Development IV, LLC

Keyanba Taylor

Blue Line Protection Management and Consulting, LLC

ARCO Management Corporation

Paradise Housing Management, LLC

Paradise Housing Partners, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Eric Michaud Jenniges

Attorney at Busby & Negin, Inc.

Suite 201, 8200 Roberts Drive

Atlanta, GA 30350

Ronald F. Negin

Attorney at Busby & Negin, Inc.

Suite 201, 8200 Roberts Drive

Atlanta, GA 30350

Christopher Reed Stovall

Attorney at Busby & Negin, Inc.

Suite 201, 8200 Roberts Drive

Atlanta, GA 30350

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

James William Cobb

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Cameron Blaine Roberts

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Suyash Agrawal

Attorney at Massey & Gail, LLP

50 East Washington Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Julia Blackburn Stone

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Peter A. Law

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30308

Brian Colty Kaplan

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

55 #1

Exhibit Ex. 2 to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss

#55

(#55) NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Exhibit by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company re #42 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Stovall, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#54

(#54) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Law, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#53

(#53) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kaplan, Brian) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#52

(#52) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Order Enforcing Jurisdiction and Venue filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (hfm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

51 #1

Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Enforce Jurisdiction and Ve

#51

(#51) Consent MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Substitute Reply Brief with Brief In Support by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Enforce Jurisdiction and Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stovall, Christopher) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#42

(#55) NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Exhibit by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company re #42 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Stovall, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#17

(#52) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Order Enforcing Jurisdiction and Venue filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (hfm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#7

(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Blue Line Protection Management and Consulting, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Vitus Development IV, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to ARCO Management Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Paradise Housing Partners, LP. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Paradise Housing Management, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Keyanba Taylor (individually and as surviving parent of TARVIS TAYLOR, deceased), Keyanba Taylor (as Administrator). (eop) Modified text on 1/8/2021 (eop). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10577026) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/08/2021)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Exhibit by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company re #42 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Stovall, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Law, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kaplan, Brian) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #17 MOTION for Order Enforcing Jurisdiction and Venue, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Order Enforcing Jurisdiction and Venue filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (hfm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #51 Motion for Order Granting Leave to Substitute Reply Brief. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/3/21. (hfm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #51 Consent MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Substitute Reply Brief, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Consent MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Substitute Reply Brief with Brief In Support by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Enforce Jurisdiction and Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stovall, Christopher) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #50 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Jenniges, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Jenniges, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/12/21. (rlb) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Blue Line Protection Management and Consulting, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Vitus Development IV, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to ARCO Management Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Paradise Housing Partners, LP. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Paradise Housing Management, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Keyanba Taylor (individually and as surviving parent of TARVIS TAYLOR, deceased), Keyanba Taylor (as Administrator). (eop) Modified text on 1/8/2021 (eop). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10577026) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vitus Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Reed Stovall