This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 09:31:43 (UTC).

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Kajima Building & Design Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 Fireman's Fund Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kajima Building Design Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dudley H. Bowen and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dudley H. Bowen

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Defendant

Kajima Building & Design Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Jones

Attorney at The Jones Law Firm, P.C.

245 Riverside Ave.Suite 510

Jacksonville, FL 32202

W. Richard Dekle

Attorney at Brennan, Wasden & Painter, LLP

P.O. Box 8047411 E. Liberty Street

Savannah, GA 31412-8047

Defendant Attorney

David Lawrence Rusnak

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham

303 Peachtree St. Nesuite 3500

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2022; Discovery due by 8/5/2022; Motions due by 9/5/2022; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 4/5/2022; and Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 5/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/21/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Filing by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Eugene Jones. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/10/2022. (pts) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Richard Dekle on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Dekle, W.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

10 #1

Civil Case Forms

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Transfer. (pts) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case and denying #3 Motion to Dismiss.. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/14/2021. (anc) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

3 #1

Brief DEFENDANT MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERN

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Kajima Building & Design Group, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2022; Discovery due by 8/5/2022; Motions due by 9/5/2022; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 4/5/2022; and Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 5/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/21/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Filing by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Eugene Jones. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 1/10/2022. (pts) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Richard Dekle on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Dekle, W.) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fee Amount $200. (cmr) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Eugene Jones, Fee Amount $200, Receipt #BWK011419, by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (gmh) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Kajima Building & Design Group, Inc. filed by Atty David L. Rusnak. (cmr) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Deficiency. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Form)(pts) Modified on 12/16/2021 (thb). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Transfer. (pts) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04329. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (anc) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. (anc) Modified on 12/15/2021 in order to update file date (anc). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case and denying #3 Motion to Dismiss.. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/14/2021. (anc) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division, MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (anc) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss, or Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division with Brief In Support by Kajima Building & Design Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief DEFENDANT MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER)(Rusnak, David) . Added MOTION to Dismiss on 11/12/2021 (anc). (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Kajima Building & Design Group, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11333019) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Rusnak