This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 07:06:32 (UTC).

Firemans Fund Insurance Company v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Firemans Fund Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Diamond Resorts International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John E. McDermott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03720

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Firemans Fund Insurance Company

Defendant

Diamond Resorts International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven D Allison

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

Samrah R Mahmoud

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Stephanie V. Phan

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33393955 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company. (Attorney Steven D Allison added to party Fireman s Fund Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company, identifying Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (AGR US), Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Europe B.V., AGCS International Holding B.V. (AGCS Int'l), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE (AGCS SE), and Allianz SE. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

CV-11C

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Diamond Resorts International, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#8

(#8) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 06/01/2022, receipt number ACACDC-33393955), filed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company.(Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#9

(#9) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. [SEE NOTICE FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (san) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company, upon Defendant Diamond Resorts International, Inc. served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc., Agent for Service of Process, by Ana Gomes, Intake Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company, upon Defendant Diamond Resorts International, Inc. served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc., Agent for Service of Process, by Ana Gomes, Intake Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. [SEE NOTICE FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (san) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 06/01/2022, receipt number ACACDC-33393955), filed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company.(Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Firemans Fund Insurance Company. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Diamond Resorts International, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company, identifying Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (AGR US), Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Europe B.V., AGCS International Holding B.V. (AGCS Int'l), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE (AGCS SE), and Allianz SE. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company. (Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33393955 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Fireman s Fund Insurance Company. (Attorney Steven D Allison added to party Fireman s Fund Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Allison, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie V Phan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D Allison