This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2020 at 09:14:22 (UTC).

Fire and Hail Restoration LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Fire and Hail Restoration LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGuard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02630

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fire and Hail Restoration LLC

Defendant

AmGuard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Jeffrey Furtado

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Nathanael Thomas Archuleta

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew W. Blubaugh

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Nicholas C. Snow

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Stephanie A. Montague

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/20/2020. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#23

(#23) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2020. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/20/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#21

(#21) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#20

(#20) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC All parties consent.. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie A. Montague on behalf of AmGuard Insurance CompanyAttorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Montague, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas C. Snow on behalf of AmGuard Insurance CompanyAttorney Nicholas C. Snow added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Snow, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#17

(#17) Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Matthew W. Blubaugh added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) by AmGuard Insurance Company.(Blubaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. AmGuard Insurance Company served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#14

(#17) Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Matthew W. Blubaugh added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) by AmGuard Insurance Company.(Blubaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

8 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Amguard Insurance Company re #5 Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Fire and Hail Restoration LLCAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Fire and Hail Restoration LLC(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#5

(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Amguard Insurance Company re #5 Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#2

(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #2 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading filed by attorney David Furtado. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AmGuard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7461945)Attorney David Jeffrey Furtado added to party Fire and Hail Restoration LLC(pty:pla), filed by Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Furtado, David) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/20/2020. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2020. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/20/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #20 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/6/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC All parties consent.. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie A. Montague on behalf of AmGuard Insurance CompanyAttorney Stephanie A. Montague added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Montague, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas C. Snow on behalf of AmGuard Insurance CompanyAttorney Nicholas C. Snow added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Snow, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Matthew W. Blubaugh added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) by AmGuard Insurance Company.(Blubaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. AmGuard Insurance Company served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/3/20, Discharging the Show Cause Order, Setting the Scheduling/Planning Conference, and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 10/6/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/20/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/1/20, returnable by Plaintiff as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2020. (nmarb, ) Modified on 9/3/2020 pursuant to #15 Order, DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#9) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Amguard Insurance Company re #5 Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Fire and Hail Restoration LLCAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Fire and Hail Restoration LLC(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Attachment 2 to ECF 1 is titled "Summons," but the attached document is not a court-approved summons. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event "Summons Request." (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #2 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading filed by attorney David Furtado. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading (First Amended Complaint) by Plaintiff Fire and Hail Restoration LLC (Furtado, David) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AmGuard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7461945)Attorney David Jeffrey Furtado added to party Fire and Hail Restoration LLC(pty:pla), filed by Fire and Hail Restoration LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Furtado, David) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Jeffrey Furtado

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathanael Thomas Archuleta