This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2019 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

Fira v. Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Fira filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chesapeake Operating, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00040

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eloy Fira

Eloy A. Fira

Defendant

Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Paul Skrabanek

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek, PLLC

3701 Kirby Drive, Suite 760

Houston, TX 77098

Michael E. Pierce

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek Bruera, PLLC

3701 Kirby Drive, Suite 760

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Molly L. Pela

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP

One Riverway, 14Th Floor

Houston, TX 77056

William R. Moye

Attorney at Thompson,Coe,Cousins & Irons, LLP

One Riverway - Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Karl W. Koen

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Pkwy., Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

Rachel Renee Vulpitta

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order Order

#9

(#9) CORRECTED MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Moye, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#8

(#8) DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** re #7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. (aej) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Moye, William) Modified on 3/4/2019 (aej). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE , Consent/Non Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Eloy A. Fira (Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Vulpitta, Rachel) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Chesapeake's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Rachel Renee Vulpitta added to party Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C..(Vulpitta, Rachel) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. (aej) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11643926), filed by Eloy Fira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order TERMINATING #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. Corrected motion filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #9 Corrected Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that William R. Moye, Molly L. Pela, and the law firm of Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P. are hereby substituted as attorneys of record for and on behalf of Defendant, Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. and that Karl W. Koen, Rachel R. Vulpitta, and Elizabeth M. Westphal of Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, L.L.P. are withdrawn as attorney of record and are relieved of any further responsibility to the Court with respect to the handling of this case on behalf of Defendant, Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORRECTED MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Moye, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** re #7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. (aej) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Moye, William) Modified on 3/4/2019 (aej). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE , Consent/Non Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Eloy A. Fira (Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Vulpitta, Rachel) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Chesapeake's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Rachel Renee Vulpitta added to party Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C..(Vulpitta, Rachel) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. (aej) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (aej) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11643926), filed by Eloy Fira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeak Operating LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Renee Vulpitta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Richards Moye

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karl Wayne Koen