This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 08:47:45 (UTC).

FinSight I LP v. Seaver et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 FinSight I LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Seaver. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11891

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FinSight I LP

Defendants

James Toga

Robert Seaver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bridgitte E. Mott

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

131 Dartmouth Street, Suite 501

Boston, MA 02116

Steven C. Reingold

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

131 Dartmouth Street

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant Attorney

Scott M. Zanolli

Attorney at Pierce & Mandell, PC

11 Beacon Street, Suite 800

Boston, MA 02108-3002

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Zanolli on behalf of Robert Seaver, James Toga (Zanolli, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Reingold on behalf of FinSight I LP (Reingold, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Seaver, James Toga.(Zanolli, Scott) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FinSight I LP. James Toga waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Reingold, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FinSight I LP. Robert Seaver waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Reingold, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FinSight I LP identifying Other Affiliate Skagit Investments Limited, Other Affiliate Finam Company Limited for FinSight I LP.. (Mott, Bridgitte) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Local Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (JS 44)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8472160 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by FinSight I LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (JS 44), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Local Category Sheet)(Mott, Bridgitte) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Zanolli on behalf of Robert Seaver, James Toga (Zanolli, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • Docket(#9) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. An Answer having been filed in this case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule.Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 1/29/21. All amendments to the pleadings and/or joinder of additional parties shall be completed by 3/1/21. The court will permit 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests without leave of court and expects those requests to be filed within 30 days of the initial disclosures. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 7/14/21 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 8/11/21. Plaintiff shall designate its expert(s), if any, and serve Rule 26(a)(2) reports no later than 9/3/21; defendants' expert witness(es), if any, will be designated and Rule 26(a)(2) reports filed no later than 9/27/21. Expert discovery must be completed by 10/22/21.If no experts are utilized, dispositive motion are due by 9/3/21, with opposition by 9/24/21. If the parties designate experts, dispositive motions are due by 11/15/21, with Oppositions due 12/6/21; Reply, if any, by leave of court. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 12/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Reingold on behalf of FinSight I LP (Reingold, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Seaver, James Toga.(Zanolli, Scott) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FinSight I LP. James Toga waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Reingold, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FinSight I LP. Robert Seaver waiver sent on 10/21/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Reingold, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FinSight I LP identifying Other Affiliate Skagit Investments Limited, Other Affiliate Finam Company Limited for FinSight I LP.. (Mott, Bridgitte) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8472160 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by FinSight I LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (JS 44), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Local Category Sheet)(Mott, Bridgitte) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less