This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:30:32 (UTC).

Finney v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Finney filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark E. Ford and Erin L. Wiedemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02190

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mark E. Ford

Erin L. Wiedemann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ervin Finney

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fred L. Caddell

Attorney at Nolan, Caddell and Reynolds, P.A.

P.O. Box 184

Fort Smith, AR 72902

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ervin Finney. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Signed Green Card Elser, #2 Stmt w Respect to Svc SS Comm, #3 USPS Tracking Info- SS Comm, #4 Stmnt w Respect to Svc US Attny Gen, #5 Signed Green Card US Attny Gen)(Caddell, Fred) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Finney, Ervin for service of the following document: 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,, Order on Motion for Service,,,, Terminate Motions,,, #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons SSA Commissioner, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(Caddell, Fred) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #7 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; Motions terminated: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Ervin Finney, #7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Ervin Finney.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 29, 2020. (cla) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Ervin Finney. (Caddell, Fred) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically, the Court requires the following information: Plaintiff has indicated that he/she receives income from multiple sources but has failed to provide information concerning those sources on his IFP application. It is also unclear whether the $3,600.00 annual income he has reported includes all sources of income. Additionally, Plaintiff has reported one dependent but has failed to indicate this dependent's relationship to him/her. If the dependent is under the age of 18, Plaintiff is reminded that the dependent's name must be redacted to initials only. All of the above information is required before the Court can rule on the Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended IFP Application on or before November 9, 2020. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 20, 2020. (cla) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Ervin Finney. (Caddell, Fred) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Ervin Finney. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Caddell, Fred) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(jlm) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Ervin Finney.(Caddell, Fred) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Ervin Finney. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (jlm) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less