This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2020 at 07:05:07 (UTC).

Finney v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Finney filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06013

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrell Finney

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David P. Waggoner

Attorney at Homeless Action Center

3126 Shattuck Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94705

 

Court Documents

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Motion for Exemption from Payment of Pacer User Fees. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Acknowledgment of Receipt of re #13 Summons Issued. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docketsummons in a civil action; waiver of service of summons, and copy of: re #1 complaint, re #12 order re ifp, and re #8 scheduling order - emailed to Social Security Administration and the United States Attorneys Office. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrell Finney. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Motion for Exemption from Payment of Pacer User Fees. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR EXEMPTION FROM PAYMENT OF PACER FEES, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Darrell Finney. Responses due by 9/15/2020. Replies due by 9/22/2020. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darrell Finney.. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrell Finney. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Darrell Finney . (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case can not be randomly assigned to judge due to missing Civil Cover Sheet and lack of filing fee having been paid. Submit your document using Civil Ev ents > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Darrell Finney (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY against Andrew M. Saul. Filed by Darrell Finney. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 8/26/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less