This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 08:38:58 (UTC).

Finney v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Finney filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01867

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Twanda Finney

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vanessa L. Kassab

Attorney at Doroshow, Pasquale, Krawitz, & Bhaya

1202 Kirkwood Highway

Wilmington, DE 19805

Defendant Attorney

Heather Benderson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19101

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2019. (kmd) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2019. (kmd) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • No Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Twanda Finney (IFP, NO Fee Paid). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Twanda Finney. (myr) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less