This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2020 at 08:40:11 (UTC).

Finney et al v. Dolan et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Finney filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dolan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kari A. Dooley and Sarah A. L. Merriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01782

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

Referral Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John K Finney

Windsor Locks, CT 06096

Sarah Olivieri

Hartford, CT 06106

John Finney

Windsor Locks, CT 06096

Defendants

Suzanne Caron

Manuel Suarez

Rober Fieldler

Sohrah Zahidi

Dolan

Fieldler

Farlow

State of New Jersey

Saurez

Wright

State Connecticut

Carol

Carron

Zahidi

Carbonneau

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Supplement

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#9

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#12) ORDER - The Court construes the Amended Complaint to be a request for additional time to file an Amended Complaint. That request is denied. The Recommended Ruling does not permit nor set a deadline for the filing of an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2019.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER adopting #9 Recommended Ruling. The Court has reviewed the Recommended Ruling of Magistrate Judge Merriam concerning the #1 Complaint. The Recommended Ruling contains an accurate statement of the applicable law and a thoroughly reasoned analysis and application of that law to the circumstances presented here. The Recommended Ruling therefore is Accepted, Adopted and So Ordered. Accordingly, the Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this matter. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/10/2019. (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dolan, State Connecticut, Carbonneau, Carol, Carron, State of New Jersey, Wright, Farlow, Zahidi, Fieldler, Saurez, filed by John Finney.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached recommended ruling, the Court recommends that the #1 Complaint be DISMISSED, with prejudice. Any objections to this recommended ruling must be filed on or before December 9, 2019. Failure to file an objection by this deadline will preclude appellate review. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 11/20/2019. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff John K. Finney ("Finney") has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to Finney's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . Finney has completed the required information. He asserts that he is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no income and no assets. See generally id. at 3-5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that Finney is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, Finney's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 11/20/2019. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and review of the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/18/2019.Motion referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Gould, K.) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/12/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/12/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2020. Discovery due by 5/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by John K Finney. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John K Finney. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Suzanne Caron, Dolan, Rober Fieldler, Manuel Suarez, Sohrah Zahidi, filed by John K Finney, Sarah Olivieri. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dolan is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CONNECTICUT is a litigant

Latest cases where CAROL is a litigant

Latest cases where Wright is a litigant