This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 05:15:05 (UTC).

Finley v. Miami University

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Finley filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Miami University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael R. Barrett and Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00379

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael R. Barrett

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Natosha Finley

Natosha L. Finley

Defendant

Miami University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Forsythe Croskery

Attorney at Croskery Law Offices - 1

3905 Eastern Ave., Suite 200

Cincinnati, OH 45226

Defendant Attorneys

Alessandro Botta Blondet

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

Pnc Center 201 E Fifth Street 26Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Patricia Anderson Pryor

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandro Botta Blondet for Defendant Miami University (Botta Blondet, Alessandro) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Miami University on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Croskery, Robert) Modified to correct service and answer dates on 6/10/2020 (sct). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:19cv984 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett and Judge Douglas R. Cole on 5/14/20. (eh) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A-1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Note: Related Case to 1:19-cv-00984 against Miami University ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7462494), filed by Natosha Finley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Croskery, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandro Botta Blondet for Defendant Miami University (Botta Blondet, Alessandro) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Miami University. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Miami University answer due 7/13/2020. (sct) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Miami University on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Croskery, Robert) Modified to correct service and answer dates on 6/10/2020 (sct). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:19cv984 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett and Judge Douglas R. Cole on 5/14/20. (eh) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Note: Related Case to 1:19-cv-00984 against Miami University ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7462494), filed by Natosha Finley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Croskery, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia Anderson Pryor