This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 10:37:02 (UTC).

FINLEY v. FACEBOOK INC

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 FINLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FACEBOOK INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHELE FINLEY

Chipley, FL 32428

C F

Defendant

FACEBOOK INC

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 10/13/2021, Plaintiff must file: a. a notice of voluntary dismissal; or b. a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff elects to file a second amended complaint, she must utilize the court-approved form, which is available from the clerk of the court or the Northern District of Florida's website free of charge. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/28/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

9 #1

Request

#9

(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS AND ANSWER TO JUDGES ORDER by MICHELE FINLEY. (Attachments: #1 Request) (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by MICHELE FINLEY. (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK INC, filed by MICHELE FINLEY. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Summary Judgment. On or before 9/29/2021, Plaintiffs shall file: a. a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or b. an amended complaint in compliance with this order. Also on or before 9/29/2021: a. Plaintiffs must pay the filing fee of $402; or b. each Plaintiff must submit separate and properly-completed motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/13/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION FOR SUMMARY OR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by MICHELE FINLEY, C F. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION FOR INJUNCTION OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by C F, MICHELE FINLEY. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by MICHELE FINLEY, C F. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against FACEBOOK INC, filed by MICHELE FINLEY, C F. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #10 Order - No response filed. (jcw) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 10/13/2021, Plaintiff must file: a. a notice of voluntary dismissal; or b. a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff elects to file a second amended complaint, she must utilize the court-approved form, which is available from the clerk of the court or the Northern District of Florida's website free of charge. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/28/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Amended Complaint, #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS AND ANSWER TO JUDGES ORDER. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS AND ANSWER TO JUDGES ORDER by MICHELE FINLEY. (Attachments: #1 Request) (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by MICHELE FINLEY. (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK INC, filed by MICHELE FINLEY. (No service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Summary Judgment. On or before 9/29/2021, Plaintiffs shall file: a. a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or b. an amended complaint in compliance with this order. Also on or before 9/29/2021: a. Plaintiffs must pay the filing fee of $402; or b. each Plaintiff must submit separate and properly-completed motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/13/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Pro Se (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION FOR SUMMARY OR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 MOTION FOR INJUNCTION OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION FOR SUMMARY OR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by MICHELE FINLEY, C F. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR INJUNCTION OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by C F, MICHELE FINLEY. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by MICHELE FINLEY, C F. (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against FACEBOOK INC, filed by MICHELE FINLEY, C F. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant