Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 13:28:57 (UTC).

FINLAY v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 FINLAY filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01957

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONNA E. FINLAY

Defendants

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

TRANSUNION, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT F. SALVIN

Attorney at PHILA DEBT CLINIC & CONSUMER LAW CENTER

Two Bala Plaza Suite 300

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004-1573

Defendant Attorneys

JONATHAN D. KLEIN

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

2005 Market St Suite 1000, One Commerce Square, Suite 1000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

WILLIAM R. BROWN

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES PC

4545 Northwestern Dr

Zionsville, IN 46077

CASEY GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF, PINCUS & GREEN, P.C.

1101 Market Street, 2700 Aramark Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19107

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

The Curtis Center, Suite 400E, 170 S. Independence Mall, W.

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3337

NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7014

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 7/12/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/3/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER THAT AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT THROUGH AND INCLUDING 7/3/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/21/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#18

(#18) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK.Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(SCHURKO, NICOLAI) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK with Certificate of Service(SCHURKO, NICOLAI) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) Request for Default DONNA E. FINLAY against AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SALVIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 6/17/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#14

(#14) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert F. Salvin re: served Summons and Complaint upon person in charge at the time by hand delivery on 06/05/2019. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; DESCRIPTION OF SERVICE DOES NOT MATCH THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT). (SALVIN, ROBERT) Modified on 6/10/2019 (fb). (Entered: 06/08/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF WILLIAM R. BROWN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/4/19. 6/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANSUNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William R. Brown, Esquire by TRANSUNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13582124.). (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

2 #1

PART 1

#2

(#11) TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANSUNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 196845.), filed by DONNA E. FINLAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 7/12/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/3/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER THAT AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT THROUGH AND INCLUDING 7/3/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/21/19. 6/21/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK.Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(SCHURKO, NICOLAI) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK with Certificate of Service(SCHURKO, NICOLAI) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Request for Default DONNA E. FINLAY against AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SALVIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 6/17/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANSUNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert F. Salvin re: served Summons and Complaint upon person in charge at the time by hand delivery on 06/05/2019. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; DESCRIPTION OF SERVICE DOES NOT MATCH THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT). (SALVIN, ROBERT) Modified on 6/10/2019 (fb). (Entered: 06/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF WILLIAM R. BROWN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/4/19. 6/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANSUNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William R. Brown, Esquire by TRANSUNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13582124.). (GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • 4 AMENDED Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. Forwarded To: ROBERT SLAVIN on 5/17/19 (jl, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC, filed by DONNA E. FINLAY, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 PART 1)(jl, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DONNA E. FINLAY. (jwl, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/6/19 (jwl, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 196845.), filed by DONNA E. FINLAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant